+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
On October 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (39-0)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
On December 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-0-0)
- Substituted for A3407
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-0)
On October 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
+ − Votes (7)
October 22, 2015: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2015: ADOPT GR
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
December 18, 2014: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
December 18, 2014: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 12
December 18, 2014: SUBSTITUTE FOR A3407
- Present/NV: 80
October 27, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
June 5, 2014: r/Sca
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1