+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Lost in the Senate CVOR (22-15) (Gordon)
- Motion To Table (22-16) (Weinberg)
- Motion To Adopt CV (Kean)
On July 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
On May 24, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (61-0-18)
- Motion To Table (Greenwald) (47-32-0)
- Motion To Aa (McHose)
- Substituted for A1011 (1R)
On May 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (29-0)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
+ − Votes (7)
October 4, 2012: TABLE MOTION
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 2
October 4, 2012: OVERRIDE
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
May 24, 2012: MOTION TAB MOTION
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2012: SUBSTITUTE FOR A1011 Aa
- Present/NV: 80
May 24, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 11
March 8, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor