+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (11)
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.219.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
- Substituted for A3236 (1R)
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (34-0)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (31-0) (Van Drew)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (8)
June 27, 2019: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 20, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 20, 2019: SUB FOR A3236 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
March 7, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
February 26, 2018: AMEND
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 9
February 26, 2018: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
February 8, 2018: r/Sca
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor