+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.192.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
- Substituted for A2167 (2R)
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
June 22, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR A2167 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 19, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
June 15, 2017: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor