+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.104.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
- Substituted for A3650 (1R)
On September 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On September 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
On July 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
On July 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (33-0)
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
+ − Votes (6)
March 14, 2019: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
February 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
February 25, 2019: SUB FOR A3650 Aca
- Present/NV: 80
September 17, 2018: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 26, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
June 14, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor