+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On January 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
- Substituted for A2276 (1R)
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeAngelo)
On December 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 11, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
January 11, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR A2276 Aa
- Present/NV: 79
January 11, 2016: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
December 17, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
December 10, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5