+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
+ − Votes (2)
February 21, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
February 7, 2019: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12