+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2012, c.35.
On June 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-1)
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 28, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (70-8-1)
- Substituted for A3154
On June 21, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
On June 7, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
On May 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
+ − Votes (6)
June 28, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2012: SUBSTITUTE FOR A3154
- Present/NV: 80
June 28, 2012: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
June 22, 2012: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
May 31, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1