+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.177.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-1)
- Substituted for A3444 (1R)
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (24-9)
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (29-0) (Scutari)
On October 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
+ − Votes (7)
May 20, 2021: SUB FOR A3444
- Present/NV: 80
May 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
May 14, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
January 11, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 7
November 16, 2020: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
November 16, 2020: AMEND
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 11
October 22, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1