+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-1)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (3)
March 16, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
January 26, 2015: r/Sca
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor