+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2013, c.80.
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
- Substituted for A2390
On September 27, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On September 24, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
On August 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (33-0)
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR A2390
- Present/NV: 80
September 27, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
August 20, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
March 8, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor