+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.27.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On November 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (56-16-2)
- Substituted for A4409 (ACS/1R)
On November 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On October 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
On August 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
+ − Votes (8)
January 11, 2021: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
November 16, 2020: SUB FOR A4409
- Present/NV: 80
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
November 12, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
October 8, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
August 27, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 24, 2020: r/SCS
- Yeas: 12
August 17, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1