+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2018, c.14.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-23-1)
- Substituted for A3685 (1R)
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (23-14)
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (29-0) (Sweeney)
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (7)
April 12, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
April 12, 2018: SUB FOR A3685 Aca
- Present/NV: 79
April 12, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 10
April 5, 2018: r/Sca
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2018: AMEND
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 11
February 26, 2018: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
February 5, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1