+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 21, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (24-0) (Weinberg)
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 17, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
December 7, 2015: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
December 7, 2015: AMEND
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 16
June 8, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
May 4, 2015: r/Sca
- Yeas: 9