+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-0)
On December 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On October 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (2)
December 18, 2014: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
December 8, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor