+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.153.
On November 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
- Substituted for A3601 (1R)
On October 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
+ − Votes (5)
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
November 16, 2020: SUB FOR A3601
- Present/NV: 80
October 22, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
March 5, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
February 13, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor