+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.149.
On July 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-2)
- Substituted for S2171 (2R)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (63-12-1)
- Motion Suspend 18:1 (DeAngelo) (Voice)
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
+ − Votes (9)
December 21, 2017:
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 36
November 2, 2017: DEANGELO
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 37
July 4, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2171
- Present/NV: 40
July 4, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
June 29, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 4
June 22, 2017: SUSPEND RULE 18:1
- Present/NV: 80
June 19, 2017: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
April 4, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor