+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by SCR133 (1R)
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate
On May 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On November 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
+ − Vote
June 22, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 13