+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for SJR85
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 11, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
January 11, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR SJR85
- Present/NV: 40
January 7, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
June 25, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 18, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor