+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2016, JR-3.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
- Substituted for SJR61
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
On June 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
June 30, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR SJR61
- Present/NV: 40
June 27, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor