+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, JR-2.
On January 31, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Substituted for SJR105 (1R)
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
On October 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On October 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On October 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
+ − Votes (6)
January 31, 2019: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
January 31, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2019: SUB FOR SJR105
- Present/NV: 40
January 17, 2019: r/Sca
- Yeas: 6
October 29, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
October 22, 2018: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor