+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
February 13, 2020: r/ACS
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor