+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.287.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S797
On October 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 3, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 3, 2021: SUB FOR S797
- Present/NV: 40
October 8, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor