+ − Full Texts (13)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.161.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-1)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (70-2-1)
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
- First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1)
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On March 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Concur by Assembly Amendments (66-0-3) (Chiaravalloti)
On January 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (32-1)
- Substituted for S2864 (2R)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (28-0) (Oroho)
On December 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On September 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
On August 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-3-2)
On August 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
+ − Votes (11)
June 30, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 7
March 25, 2021: CONCUR ASMB AMEND
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 1, 2021: CONCUR BY AMEND
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 11
January 28, 2021: SUB FOR S2864
- Present/NV: 40
January 28, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
January 11, 2021: AMEND
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 12
January 11, 2021: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
December 11, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
August 27, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
August 10, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor