+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (60-8-4)
On March 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reviewed by the Pension and Health Benefits Commission Recommend to enact
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 8
March 2, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3