+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (34-0) (Singer)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (36-0) (Singer)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 2, 2021: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
December 2, 2021: AMEND
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 10, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
March 8, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor