+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 18, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
February 13, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor