+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On August 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (65-4-4)
On February 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
+ − Votes (3)
December 14, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
July 30, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
January 27, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6