+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.286.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
- Substituted for S2670
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On August 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 21, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
June 21, 2021: SUB FOR S2670
- Present/NV: 40
March 22, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
July 30, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
March 5, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7