+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.167.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-9)
- Substituted for S3922
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (48-22-2)
On June 16, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
June 30, 2021: SUB FOR S3922
- Present/NV: 40
June 21, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 8
June 16, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor