+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.304.
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S3763
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
On May 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 30, 2021: SUB FOR S3763
- Present/NV: 40
June 24, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 14, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor