+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.131.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
- Substituted for S3633 (1R)
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 24, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
June 24, 2021: SUB FOR S3633
- Present/NV: 40
June 22, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 13
June 2, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor