+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On September 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.266.
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-1)
- Substituted for S3972
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (4)
August 26, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
August 26, 2019: SUB FOR S3972
- Present/NV: 40
June 20, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 18, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1