+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.16.
On December 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
On November 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On November 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-0)
- Substituted for S385 (1R)
- Senate Amendment (34-0) (Stack)
On October 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On May 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
+ − Votes (8)
December 19, 2016: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
November 14, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR S385
- Present/NV: 40
November 14, 2016: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
November 14, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
November 14, 2016: AMEND
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
October 13, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
May 26, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
February 22, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor