+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2018, c.94.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S2257 (1R)
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On March 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On February 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 25, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2018: SUB FOR S2257
- Present/NV: 40
June 18, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
March 26, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
February 1, 2018: r/ACS
- Yeas: 5