+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (22-1) (Singleton)
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (55-13-3)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 10, 2019: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
June 10, 2019: AMEND
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 17
June 3, 2019: r/Sca
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 9
May 20, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor