+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.326.
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
On December 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On November 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
- First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S3421 (1R)
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
+ − Votes (7)
December 20, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
December 20, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
June 3, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 3, 2021: SUB FOR S3421
- Present/NV: 40
May 6, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 8
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
March 8, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor