+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S3441 (1R)
On December 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
December 20, 2021: SUB FOR S3441
- Present/NV: 40
December 16, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
June 24, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
March 15, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor