+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On July 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.180.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S3597
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 21, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 21, 2021: SUB FOR S3597
- Present/NV: 40
June 10, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
March 8, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor