+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S3404 (1R)
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-1)
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
December 20, 2021: SUB FOR S3404
- Present/NV: 40
December 6, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
May 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
May 18, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor