+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.199.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-15)
- Substituted for S3361 (1R)
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (46-24-0)
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 24, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
June 24, 2021: SUB FOR S3361
- Present/NV: 40
June 22, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 21, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 10
June 2, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor