+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
On January 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On December 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
+ − Votes (3)
May 6, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
January 13, 2021: r/ACS
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor