+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On December 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
+ − Votes (4)
May 6, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 7
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
March 17, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
January 13, 2021: r/ACS
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor