+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.34.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-9)
- Substituted for S3244 (1R)
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (60-15-0)
On January 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On January 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On December 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
+ − Votes (5)
February 19, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
February 19, 2021: SUB FOR S3244
- Present/NV: 40
February 11, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
January 11, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 4
January 7, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor