+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.302.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S3031 (2R)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0)
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On December 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On November 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 3, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 3, 2021: SUB FOR S3031
- Present/NV: 40
May 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
February 24, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor