+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-1)
- Substituted for S3314 (1R)
On November 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
On June 21, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (69-2-1)
On January 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On November 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Special Committee on Infrastructure and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
December 20, 2021: SUB FOR S3314
- Present/NV: 40
November 15, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 4
June 21, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
January 27, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor