+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.68.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
- Substituted for S3414 (2R)
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (78-1-1)
On March 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
On February 7, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 1
March 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 25, 2019: SUB FOR S3414
- Present/NV: 40
March 6, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
March 6, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3