+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0)
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
On January 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 80
March 18, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor