+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
- Substituted for S4340
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
On December 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-1)
On December 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 13, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
January 13, 2020: SUB FOR S4340
- Present/NV: 40
January 9, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13
December 16, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
December 12, 2019: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1