+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On September 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.230.
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (40-0)
- Substituted for S3744 (1R)
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
On January 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On October 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
+ − Votes (7)
June 24, 2021: SUB FOR S3744
- Present/NV: 40
June 24, 2021: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
June 24, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
June 17, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
March 17, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
January 25, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6